House
|
12/31/2023
|
Assigned Pa 234'23
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/29/2023 01:16 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 11/28/2023 01:30 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 11/21/2023 10:16 Am
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 493 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 670 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Energy And Environment
|
|
|
House
|
11/03/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 484 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/10/2023
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Energy, Communications, And Technology
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Ranjeev Puri
|
|
|