Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5144 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 9, 2023
Bill November 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 16, 2023

Chaptered

Bill December 4, 2023