Senate | 11/14/2023 | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 572 Yeas 99 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Notice Given To Discharge Committee | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Referred To Committee On Families, Children And Seniors | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/17/2023 | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Introduced By Representative Pat Outman |