House | 12/31/2024 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment | ||
House | 12/23/2024 | Bill Ordered Enrolled 12/23/2024 | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 701 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Amendment(s) Defeated | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Discharge Committee Approved | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 11/26/2024 | Referred To Committee On Labor | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 349 Yeas 57 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/17/2023 | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Introduced By Representative Amos O'neal |