Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5169 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill December 20, 2024
Bill June 26, 2024

Enrolled

Bill January 8, 2025

Chaptered

Bill January 21, 2025