Senate | 06/18/2024 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | ||
House | 06/13/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/13/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 169 Yeas 77 Nays 32 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 06/13/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/12/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/12/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/18/2023 | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Introduced By Representative Carrie Rheingans |