House
|
07/30/2024
|
Assigned Pa 93'24 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
07/30/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/23/2024 11:54 Am
|
|
|
House
|
07/30/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 07/23/2024 09:54 Am
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 07/11/2024 01:06 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 297 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 Yeas 89 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/19/2023
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Alabas Farhat
|
|
|