Senate | 06/26/2024 | Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection | ||
House | 06/25/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/25/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 220 Yeas 106 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 06/25/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/25/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 06/25/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/25/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 05/16/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 05/16/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/24/2023 | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Introduced By Representative Mike Mcfall |