House
|
04/09/2024
|
Assigned Pa 30'24
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 04/01/2024 03:18 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 04/01/2024 10:44 Am
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 03/27/2024 10:56 Am
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 75 Yeas 22 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 537 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/24/2023
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Penelope Tsernoglou
|
|
|