Senate | 06/11/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 06/11/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
House | 06/04/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/04/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 147 Yeas 78 Nays 30 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 06/04/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 06/04/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/25/2023 | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Introduced By Representative Bill Schuette |