Senate | 06/25/2024 | Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 184 Yeas 98 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/13/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/13/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 06/13/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/26/2023 | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Introduced By Representative William Bruck |