House | 12/13/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services | ||
House | 12/31/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/14/2023 | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Introduced By Representative Jasper Martus |