Senate | 12/18/2024 | Referred To Committee On Government Operations | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Title Amended | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 394 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Substitute (h-2) Adopted | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) | ||
House | 12/31/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/14/2023 | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Introduced By Representative Julie M. Rogers |