House | 06/11/2024 | Postponed For The Day | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Vote Reconsidered | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Rule Suspended | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/05/2024 | Notice Of Intent To Reconsider Given | ||
House | 06/05/2024 | Returned As Requested | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | Return Granted | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | Discharge Committee Approved | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | House Requests Return | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 27 Yeas 98 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 12/31/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/14/2023 | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Introduced By Representative David Prestin |