Senate | 12/18/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 12/18/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 06/12/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 06/12/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | Referred To Committee On Housing And Human Services | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 47 Yeas 104 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 12/31/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/14/2023 | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Introduced By Representative Kelly Breen |