Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5392 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2024
Bill April 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 25, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 30, 2024