Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5429 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2024

Engrossed

Bill June 26, 2024
Bill May 22, 2024

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2024

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2024