Senate | 12/18/2024 | Referred To Committee On Government Operations | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 409 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/7/2024 | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Introduced By Representative Joey Andrews |