Senate | 06/18/2024 | Reassigned To Committee On Appropriations | ||
Senate | 06/18/2024 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | ||
Senate | 06/18/2024 | Discharge Committee Approved | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection | ||
House | 06/12/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/12/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 167 Yeas 103 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 06/12/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 05/21/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 05/21/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/05/2024 | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Introduced By Representative Will Snyder |