Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5551 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2024

Engrossed

Bill December 20, 2024
Bill September 25, 2024

Enrolled

Bill January 8, 2025

Chaptered

Bill January 21, 2025