Senate | 07/30/2024 | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Affairs | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 278 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 06/05/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 06/05/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/13/2024 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred To Committee On Energy, Communications, And Technology | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Introduced By Representative Helena Scott |