Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Discharge Committee Approved | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety | ||
House | 06/12/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/12/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 165 Yeas 108 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 06/12/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/04/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/04/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 05/21/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 05/21/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/13/2024 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Introduced By Representative Matt Bierlein |