House | 12/31/2024 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 12/31/2024 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title | ||
House | 12/23/2024 | Bill Ordered Enrolled 12/23/2024 | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 658 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 12/10/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 12/10/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 12/10/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 12/10/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Title Amended | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 250 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Substitute (h-3) Adopted | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 06/18/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 06/18/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/13/2024 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred To Committee On Elections | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Introduced By Representative Joey Andrews |