Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5600 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 20, 2024

Engrossed

Bill December 11, 2024
Bill September 25, 2024

Enrolled

Bill December 18, 2024

Chaptered

Bill January 21, 2025