Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5636 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill December 20, 2024
Bill December 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill January 8, 2025

Chaptered

Bill January 21, 2025