Senate | 10/02/2024 | Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 318 Yeas 103 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 06/05/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 06/05/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Energy, Communications, And Technology | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/25/2024 | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Introduced By Representative Jenn Hill |