House
|
12/03/2024
|
Assigned Pa 159'24
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/03/2024 01:14 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 12/03/2024 10:14 Am
|
|
|
House
|
11/26/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 11/20/2024 03:30 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 329 Yeas 105 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2024
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2024
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Title Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/23/2024
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/23/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 383 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/23/2024
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/23/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/23/2024
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/23/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/23/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2024
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Regulatory Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 253 Yeas 107 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/25/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Introduced By Representative Tullio Liberati
|
|
|