House | 12/10/2024 | Notice Given To Discharge Committee | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Title Amended | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 258 Yeas 104 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Substitute (h-2) Adopted | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/30/2024 | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Introduced By Representative Brenda Carter |