House | 06/27/2024 | Postponed Temporarily | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Substitute (h-2) Adopted | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 06/04/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 06/04/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/30/2024 | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Introduced By Representative Natalie Price |