Senate | 06/25/2024 | Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 185 Yeas 106 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/13/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/13/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/09/2024 | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Introduced By Representative Robert J. Bezotte |