Senate | 07/30/2024 | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 271 Yeas 70 Nays 40 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Postponed Temporarily | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Vote On Passage Reconsidered | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 260 Yeas 69 Nays 39 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Amendment(s) Reconsidered | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Returned To Second Reading | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Motion To Refer To Third Reading Reconsidered | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 06/04/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 06/04/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 05/16/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/16/2024 | ||
House | 05/16/2024 | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure | ||
House | 05/16/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 05/16/2024 | Introduced By Representative Tyrone Carter |