Senate | 12/18/2024 | Referred To Committee On Government Operations | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 523 Yeas 56 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 54 | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/21/2024 | ||
House | 05/21/2024 | Referred To Committee On Education | ||
House | 05/21/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 05/21/2024 | Introduced By Representative Carol Glanville |