Senate | 12/18/2024 | Referred To Committee On Government Operations | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 463 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Placed On Second Reading | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Notice Given To Discharge Committee | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/06/2024 | ||
House | 06/06/2024 | Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services | ||
House | 06/06/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/06/2024 | Introduced By Representative Cynthia Neeley |