House
|
10/15/2024
|
Assigned Pa 127'24
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 10/03/2024 03:06 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 10/03/2024 02:16 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 10/02/2024 03:02 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 308 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 349 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
Vote Reconsidered
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
Defeated Roll Call # 348 Yeas 19 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
Placed On Order Of General Orders
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2024
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 211 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2024
|
Substitute (h-2) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Placed On Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Motion To Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2024
|
Notice Given To Discharge Committee
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2024
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/11/2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2024
|
Introduced By Representative Matt Koleszar
|
|
|