Senate | 12/18/2024 | Referred To Committee On Government Operations | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 425 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/25/2024 | ||
House | 06/25/2024 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | ||
House | 06/25/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/25/2024 | Introduced By Representative Tyrone Carter |