Senate | 11/26/2024 | Referred To Committee On Local Government | ||
House | 11/14/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 11/14/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 362 Yeas 95 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 8 | ||
House | 11/14/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 11/14/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 11/14/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 11/14/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 11/12/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 11/12/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 08/14/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/13/2024 | ||
House | 08/13/2024 | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform | ||
House | 08/13/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 08/13/2024 | Introduced By Representative Tyrone Carter |