Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5944 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 HOUSE BILL NO. 5944 A bill to amend 1967 PA 281, entitled "Income tax act of 1967," by amending section 51d (MCL 206.51d), as amended by 2020 PA 75. the people of the state of michigan enact: Sec. 51d. In addition to the distributions under sections 51, 51e, and 51f, the following amounts of revenue collected from the tax levied under section 51 shall be deposited into the state treasury to the credit of the Michigan transportation fund created in section 10 of 1951 PA 51, MCL 247.660, and disbursed as provided in section 10(1)(l) 10(1)(m) of 1951 PA 51, MCL 247.660: (a) Beginning October 1, 2018 through September 30, 2019, $264,000,000.00 unless the minimum foundation allowance falls below the 2017-2018 minimum foundation allowance established under section 20 of the state school aid act of 1979, 1979 PA 94, MCL 388.1620, as amended by 2017 PA 108, then $150,000,000.00. (b) Beginning October 1, 2019 through September 30, 2020, $468,000,000.00 unless the minimum foundation allowance falls below the 2017-2018 minimum foundation allowance established under section 20 of the state school aid act of 1979, 1979 PA 94, MCL 388.1620, as amended by 2017 PA 108, then $325,000,000.00. (c) Beginning October 1, 2020 and each October 1 thereafter, $600,000,000.00. Enacting section 1. This amendatory act does not take effect unless Senate Bill No.____ or House Bill No. 5945 (request no. 06350'24) of the 102nd Legislature is enacted into law.
22
33
44
55
66
77
88
99
1010
1111
1212
1313
1414
1515
1616
1717
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323 HOUSE BILL NO. 5944
2424
2525
2626
2727 A bill to amend 1967 PA 281, entitled
2828
2929 "Income tax act of 1967,"
3030
3131 by amending section 51d (MCL 206.51d), as amended by 2020 PA 75.
3232
3333 the people of the state of michigan enact:
3434
3535 Sec. 51d. In addition to the distributions under sections 51, 51e, and 51f, the following amounts of revenue collected from the tax levied under section 51 shall be deposited into the state treasury to the credit of the Michigan transportation fund created in section 10 of 1951 PA 51, MCL 247.660, and disbursed as provided in section 10(1)(l) 10(1)(m) of 1951 PA 51, MCL 247.660:
3636
3737 (a) Beginning October 1, 2018 through September 30, 2019, $264,000,000.00 unless the minimum foundation allowance falls below the 2017-2018 minimum foundation allowance established under section 20 of the state school aid act of 1979, 1979 PA 94, MCL 388.1620, as amended by 2017 PA 108, then $150,000,000.00.
3838
3939 (b) Beginning October 1, 2019 through September 30, 2020, $468,000,000.00 unless the minimum foundation allowance falls below the 2017-2018 minimum foundation allowance established under section 20 of the state school aid act of 1979, 1979 PA 94, MCL 388.1620, as amended by 2017 PA 108, then $325,000,000.00.
4040
4141 (c) Beginning October 1, 2020 and each October 1 thereafter, $600,000,000.00.
4242
4343 Enacting section 1. This amendatory act does not take effect unless Senate Bill No.____ or House Bill No. 5945 (request no. 06350'24) of the 102nd Legislature is enacted into law.