House
|
12/31/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled 12/23/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 637 Yeas 33 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/18/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/18/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/11/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/11/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2024
|
Reassigned To Committee On Regulatory Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/26/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 357 Yeas 101 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 8
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2024
|
Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2024
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/15/2024
|
|
|
House
|
09/26/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
09/26/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/26/2024
|
Introduced By Representative Tyrone Carter
|
|
|