Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5951 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 26, 2024

Engrossed

Bill December 19, 2024
Bill November 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill January 8, 2025

Chaptered

Bill January 21, 2025