Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Discharge Committee Approved | ||
Senate | 12/18/2024 | Referred To Committee On Government Operations | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 471 Yeas 105 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Placed On Second Reading | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Notice Given To Discharge Committee | ||
House | 10/15/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/15/2024 | ||
House | 09/26/2024 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | ||
House | 09/26/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 09/26/2024 | Introduced By Representative Jennifer Conlin |