Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Discharge Committee Approved | ||
Senate | 12/18/2024 | Referred To Committee On Government Operations | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 506 Yeas 56 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 54 | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Substitute (h-3) Adopted | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Substitute (h-2) Adopted | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) | ||
House | 11/12/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/12/2024 | ||
House | 11/07/2024 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | ||
House | 11/07/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 11/07/2024 | Introduced By Representative Christine Morse |