Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB6056 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 HOUSE BILL NO. 6056 A bill to amend 2014 PA 138, entitled "Workforce opportunity wage act," by amending sections 4 and 4b (MCL 408.414 and 408.414b); and to repeal acts and parts of acts. the people of the state of michigan enact: Sec. 4. (1) Subject to the exceptions specified in this act, the minimum hourly wage rate is: (a) Before September 1, 2014, $7.40. (b) Beginning September 1, 2014, $8.15. (c) Beginning January 1, 2016, $8.50. (d) Beginning January 1, 2017, $8.90. (e) Beginning January 1, 2018, $9.25. (a) Beginning January 1, 2025, $12.00. (b) Beginning January 1, 2026, $12.50. (c) Beginning January 1, 2027, $13.00. (d) Beginning January 1, 2028, $14.00. (e) Beginning January 1, 2029, $15.00. (2) Every January beginning in January 2019, 2030, the state treasurer shall adjust the minimum wage by an amount determined by the state treasurer at the end of the immediately preceding calendar year to reflect the average annual percentage change in the consumer price index Consumer Price Index for the most recent 5-year period for which data are available. As used in this subsection, "consumer price index" "Consumer Price Index" means the most comprehensive index of consumer prices available for the midwest region from the bureau Bureau of labor statistics Labor Statistics of the United States department Department of labor. Labor. The wage and hours division of the department of licensing and regulatory affairs shall post the adjusted minimum wage on its website by not later than February 1 of the year it is calculated, and the adjusted rate is effective beginning April 1 of that year. An annual increase under this subsection shall must not exceed 3.5%. (3) An increase in the minimum hourly wage rate as prescribed in subsection (2) does not take effect if the unemployment rate determined by the bureau Bureau of labor statistics, Labor Statistics of the United States department Department of labor, Labor, for this state is 8.5% 7.5% or greater more for the year immediately preceding the year of the prescribed increase. Sec. 4b. (1) An employer may pay a new employee who is less than 20 years of age a training hourly wage of $4.25 that is 75% of the general minimum hourly wage established under section 4 for the first 90 days of that employee's employment. The hourly wage authorized under this subsection is in lieu of the minimum hourly wage otherwise prescribed by this act. (2) Except as provided in subsection (1), the minimum hourly wage for an employee who is less than 18 years of age is 85% of the general minimum hourly wage established in under section 4. (3) An employer shall not displace an employee to hire an individual at the hourly wage authorized under this section. As used in this subsection, "displace" includes termination of employment or any reduction of hours, wages, or employment benefits. (4) A person who violates subsection (3) is subject to a civil fine of not more than $1,000.00. Enacting section 1. The improved workforce opportunity wage act, 2018 PA 337, MCL 408.931 to 408.945, is repealed.
22
33
44
55
66
77
88
99
1010
1111
1212
1313
1414
1515
1616
1717
1818
1919
2020
2121 HOUSE BILL NO. 6056
2222
2323
2424
2525 A bill to amend 2014 PA 138, entitled
2626
2727 "Workforce opportunity wage act,"
2828
2929 by amending sections 4 and 4b (MCL 408.414 and 408.414b); and to repeal acts and parts of acts.
3030
3131 the people of the state of michigan enact:
3232
3333 Sec. 4. (1) Subject to the exceptions specified in this act, the minimum hourly wage rate is:
3434
3535 (a) Before September 1, 2014, $7.40.
3636
3737 (b) Beginning September 1, 2014, $8.15.
3838
3939 (c) Beginning January 1, 2016, $8.50.
4040
4141 (d) Beginning January 1, 2017, $8.90.
4242
4343 (e) Beginning January 1, 2018, $9.25.
4444
4545 (a) Beginning January 1, 2025, $12.00.
4646
4747 (b) Beginning January 1, 2026, $12.50.
4848
4949 (c) Beginning January 1, 2027, $13.00.
5050
5151 (d) Beginning January 1, 2028, $14.00.
5252
5353 (e) Beginning January 1, 2029, $15.00.
5454
5555 (2) Every January beginning in January 2019, 2030, the state treasurer shall adjust the minimum wage by an amount determined by the state treasurer at the end of the immediately preceding calendar year to reflect the average annual percentage change in the consumer price index Consumer Price Index for the most recent 5-year period for which data are available. As used in this subsection, "consumer price index" "Consumer Price Index" means the most comprehensive index of consumer prices available for the midwest region from the bureau Bureau of labor statistics Labor Statistics of the United States department Department of labor. Labor. The wage and hours division of the department of licensing and regulatory affairs shall post the adjusted minimum wage on its website by not later than February 1 of the year it is calculated, and the adjusted rate is effective beginning April 1 of that year. An annual increase under this subsection shall must not exceed 3.5%.
5656
5757 (3) An increase in the minimum hourly wage rate as prescribed in subsection (2) does not take effect if the unemployment rate determined by the bureau Bureau of labor statistics, Labor Statistics of the United States department Department of labor, Labor, for this state is 8.5% 7.5% or greater more for the year immediately preceding the year of the prescribed increase.
5858
5959 Sec. 4b. (1) An employer may pay a new employee who is less than 20 years of age a training hourly wage of $4.25 that is 75% of the general minimum hourly wage established under section 4 for the first 90 days of that employee's employment. The hourly wage authorized under this subsection is in lieu of the minimum hourly wage otherwise prescribed by this act.
6060
6161 (2) Except as provided in subsection (1), the minimum hourly wage for an employee who is less than 18 years of age is 85% of the general minimum hourly wage established in under section 4.
6262
6363 (3) An employer shall not displace an employee to hire an individual at the hourly wage authorized under this section. As used in this subsection, "displace" includes termination of employment or any reduction of hours, wages, or employment benefits.
6464
6565 (4) A person who violates subsection (3) is subject to a civil fine of not more than $1,000.00.
6666
6767 Enacting section 1. The improved workforce opportunity wage act, 2018 PA 337, MCL 408.931 to 408.945, is repealed.