Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB6075 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2024

Engrossed

Bill December 20, 2024
Bill December 11, 2024

Enrolled

Bill January 8, 2025

Chaptered

Bill January 17, 2025