Senate | 12/20/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 712 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Discharge Committee Approved | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 12/18/2024 | Referred To Committee On Government Operations | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Title Amended | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 481 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 11/26/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/26/2024 | ||
House | 11/14/2024 | Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security | ||
House | 11/14/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 11/14/2024 | Introduced By Representative Felicia Brabec |