Senate | 12/18/2024 | Referred To Committee On Government Operations | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 536 Yeas 56 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 54 | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Placed On Second Reading | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Notice Given To Discharge Committee | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 12/03/2024 | ||
House | 11/26/2024 | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy | ||
House | 11/26/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 11/26/2024 | Introduced By Representative Amos O'neal |