House | 12/23/2024 | Bill Ordered Enrolled 12/23/2024 | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 723 Yeas 23 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Discharge Committee Approved | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 12/18/2024 | Referred To Committee On Government Operations | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 508 Yeas 56 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 54 | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 12/04/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 12/04/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 12/03/2024 | ||
House | 11/26/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 11/26/2024 | Introduced By Representative Tyrone Carter |