House | 12/12/2024 | Postponed Temporarily | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 12/04/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 12/04/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 12/03/2024 | ||
House | 11/26/2024 | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Small Business | ||
House | 11/26/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 11/26/2024 | Introduced By Representative Kristian Grant |