Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0222

Introduced
4/18/24  

Caption

A resolution to declare April 16, 2024, as Librarian and Library Worker Day in the state of Michigan.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

MI HR0081

A resolution to declare April 25, 2023, as Librarian and Library Worker Day in the state of Michigan.

MI SR0111

A resolution to recognize April 28, 2024, as Workers’ Memorial Day.

MI SR0037

A resolution to recognize April 28, 2023, as Workers’ Memorial Day.

MI HR0229

A resolution to declare April 28, 2024, as Worker Memorial Day in the state of Michigan.

MI HR0300

A resolution to declare September 2024 as Canine Companions Month in the state of Michigan.

MI HR0195

A resolution to commemorate the 100th anniversary of JCI Michigan.

MI HR0125

A resolution to declare June 27, 2023, as Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder Awareness Day in the state of Michigan.

MI SR0033

A resolution to commemorate Ronald Olson upon his retirement from his role as the Chief of Parks and Recreation at the Michigan Department of Natural Resources (DNR).