Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0230

Introduced
4/24/24  

Caption

A resolution to urge the Michigan Department of Labor and Economic Opportunity, the Michigan Occupational Safety and Health Administration, the United States Department of Labor - Occupational Safety and Health Administration, and all those responsible for the safety of Michigan’s workers to do everything in their power to decrease workplace injuries and deaths and make worksites safer for all hardworking Michiganders.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

MI HR0229

A resolution to declare April 28, 2024, as Worker Memorial Day in the state of Michigan.

MI HR0289

A resolution to declare June 27, 2024, as Public Employee Freedom Day in the state of Michigan.

MI HR0285

A resolution to urge the United States Congress to pass the Kidney Patient Access to Technologically Innovative and Essential Nephrology Treatments (PATIENT) Act of 2023.

MI SR0018

A resolution affirming that the Michigan Senate recognizes diversity, equity, and inclusion as essential foundational principles for achieving the American Dream and encouraging policymakers, educational institutions, workplaces, and other organizations throughout the state and nation to adopt and uphold these principles in their work.

MI HR0313

A resolution to declare October 2024 as Disability Employment Awareness Month in the state of Michigan.

MI SR0004

A resolution to commemorate February 1, 2023, as the 125th anniversary of the Michigan Association of Counties (MAC).

MI HR0245

A resolution to declare May 1, 2024, as International Workers’ Day in the state of Michigan.

MI HR0088

A resolution to declare May 1, 2023, as International Workers Day in the state of Michigan.