Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0012'23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 04/05/2023 02:02 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Approved By Governor 04/05/2023 11:28 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Presented To Governor 04/03/2023 01:24 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 40 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Received On 03/08/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Immediate Effect Defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 41 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Committee Recommended Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Health Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Erika Geiss
|
|
|